SB0967 (CH0572)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017

Sponsored by:

Senator Klausmeier

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572


Synopsis:Requiring the State Court Administrator of the Administrative Office of the Courts to assess specified drug court programs to make specified determinations; stating the intent of the General Assembly that the Administrative Office request an appropriation of $2,000,000 in additional funding for grants to expand the scope of drug court programs; requiring the Behavioral Health Administration to establish at least 1 crisis treatment center by June 1, 2018; authorizing the Overdose Response Program; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Klausmeier, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Mathias, Middleton, Miller, Oaks, Reilly, Rosapepe, and Simonaire
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1329
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee Hearing
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
Insurance - Health
Education - Miscellaneous
Narrow Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages -see also- AB-By Subd; Subst Abuse; etc.
Consumer Price Index
Controlled Dangerous Substances -see also- Drugs; Subst Abus
Correctional Institutions -see also- Patuxent Institution
Drugs -see also- Controlled Dangerous Sub; Substance Abuse
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Health Care Facilities -see also- Clinics; Hospices; etc
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Hospitals -see also- Clinics; State Hospitals
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Information
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Telephones
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(13-101, 13-101.1)
Article - Criminal Law
(5-301, 5-307)
Article - Health - General
(13-3101 through 13-3103, 13-3104 through 13-3106, 13-3104, 13-3107 through 13-3111, 5-901, 5-903 through 5-905, 13-3401, 13-3402, 16-201.3, 19-310.3, 7.5-207, 7.5-501, 8-1101, 8-407)
Article - Insurance
(15-850)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


June 1, 2017 9:04 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Finance
2/10/20172/10/2017Reassigned to Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs21A
2/7/20172/7/2017Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/27/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/27/20173/23/2017Favorable with Amendments {317377/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/28/20173/24/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)53
House3/28/20173/23/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations57
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
4/5/20174/5/2017Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/7/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {316883/1 Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed with Amendments65
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-1)66
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments63A
Third Reading Passed (46-0)63A
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 25, 2017 12:50 P.M.