SB1023

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process

Sponsored by:

Senator Zucker

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)


Synopsis:Requiring the Department of Legislative Services to obtain adjusted census data and provide the census data to a temporary redistricting commission; creating a temporary redistricting commission; requiring the Commission to hold at least six public hearings and to include areas that reflect the State's geographic, racial, and ethnic diversity; requiring the Commission to prepare and adopt a districting plan and map for congressional districts; making the Act contingent on the enactment of a similar process by specified states; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Zucker, Conway, Astle, Benson, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Smith, Young, and Zirkin
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingRules and Executive Nominations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Government - General Assembly
Elections
Narrow Subject(s):Attorney General
Boundaries
Census -see also- Data; Demographics
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Congress, U.S.
Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Elections -see also- Ballots; Camp Financ; Pol Cands; Voting
Hearings
Interstate Affairs
Legislative Services, Department of
Political Candidates
Political Parties
Public Information
Public Officials -see also- Atty Gen; Compt; Coun Admin; etc
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Secretary of State
Voting -see also- Ballots; Elections
Statutes:Article - Election Law
(8-6A-01 through 8-6A-09)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 5, 2017 3:26 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/8/20172/8/2017First Reading Senate Rules
2/15/20172/15/2017Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/20172/17/2017Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20173/20/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/20173/19/2017Favorable with Amendments {294532/148
Laid Over (Senator Zucker) Adopted48
3/22/20173/20/2017Favorable with Amendments {294532/1 Report Adopted (30-15)49
Floor Amendment {643522/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (16-30)49
Floor Amendment {613529/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-28)49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/23/20173/21/2017Third Reading Passed (30-16)50
House3/24/20173/21/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations55
3/27/20173/27/2017Hearing 3/30 at 2:30 p.m.
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/7/20173/31/2017Floor Amendment {883827/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (53-83)65
Floor Amendment {633125/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (52-81)65
Floor Amendment {563122/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (51-83)65
Third Reading Passed (87-51)65
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/8/20175/8/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2017 4:55 P.M.