SB1028

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

In the Senate - Returned Passed


Synopsis:Prohibiting certain mental health or child care practitioners from engaging in conversion therapy with individuals who are minors; providing that a certain mental health or child care practitioner who engages in conversion therapy with a minor shall be considered to have engaged in unprofessional conduct subject to disciplinary action; defining "conversion therapy" as a practice or treatment by a mental health or child care practitioner that seeks to change an individual's sexual orientation or gender identity; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Madaleno, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Lee, Manno, Pinsky, Smith, Zucker, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0902
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingHealth and Government Operations
Broad Subject(s):Health Occupations
Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Counselors -see also- Guidance Counselors; Social Workers
Ethics
Gender -see also- Women
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Mental and Behavioral Health
Psychiatrists
Psychologists
Sexual Orientation
Youth -see also- Minors
Statutes:Article - Health Occupations
(1-212.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 3, 2018 8:57 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20183/22/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/20183/20/2018Favorable with Amendments {664932/151
Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 51
3/26/20183/22/2018Favorable with Amendments {664932/153
Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted53
3/27/20183/23/2018Committee Amendment Adopted54
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (32-14)54
Floor Amendment {893529/2 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (13-33)54
Floor Amendment {453624/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected54
Floor Amendment {263124/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/28/20183/24/2018Third Reading Passed (34-12)55
House3/29/20183/22/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations56
3/30/20184/2/2018Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
4/3/20184/3/2018Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/3/20183/25/2018Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/4/20183/26/2018Floor Amendment {353422/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (39-81)60
Floor Amendment {133826/2 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (37-88)60
Floor Amendment {353825/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (36-86)60
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Atterbeary) Adopted60
Third Reading Passed (95-27)60
Senate4/5/20183/31/2018Returned Passed62

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 5, 2018 11:07 A.M.