SB1060 (CH0574)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)

Sponsored by:

Senator Miller

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574


Synopsis:Requiring a county board of education to consult with the county superintendent of schools before any change in the hiring or termination of personnel in connection with a school health services program; requiring the drug addiction and prevention program implemented in the public schools to include instruction on heroin and opioid addiction and prevention, including information on the lethal effects of fentanyl; prohibiting specified personnel from being held personally liable under specified circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Miller, Conway, Pinsky, Bates, Kagan, Nathan-Pulliam, Robinson, Salling, Simonaire, Waugh, Young, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1082
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingHealth and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Higher Education
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Office of the Courts
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Communications -see also- Electronic Comm; Language; Telecom
Controlled Dangerous Substances -see also- Drugs; Subst Abus
Drugs -see also- Controlled Dangerous Sub; Substance Abuse
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Board of
Forms
Good Samaritan
Grants
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Higher Education Commission
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Nurses
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Substance Abuse
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-401, 7-411, 11-1201 through 11-1204, 15-121, 7-426.5)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


June 1, 2017 9:04 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/13/20172/13/2017First Reading Senate Rules
2/15/20172/15/2017Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/27/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/20173/23/2017Favorable with Amendments {254839/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/28/20173/24/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)53
House3/28/20173/23/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations57
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
4/5/20174/5/2017Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/7/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {766683/1 Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed with Amendments65
4/8/20174/1/2017Floor Amendment {673221/1 (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted66
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)66
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (45-0)62
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 25, 2017 12:50 P.M.