SB1122 (CH0357)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education – Commercial Gaming Revenues – Constitutional Amendment

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 357


Synopsis:Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to limit the uses of certain revenues to educational opportunities and programs for the children of the State in public schools, the advancement of educators, and the construction of school facilities; requiring the Governor to include in the budget submission certain amounts in certain fiscal years as supplemental funding for certain purposes; requiring that certain funding be in addition to certain State funding provided for certain grades in public schools; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kasemeyer, King, McFadden, Madaleno, Manno, Peters, Middleton, Muse, Hershey, Simonaire, Robinson, Kelley, Pinsky, Lee, Klausmeier, Kagan, Feldman, and Smith
Additional Facts:Bill is a Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1697
Bill File Type: Regular
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on a referendum
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Ways and Means
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Operating Budget
Gaming
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Constitutional Amendments
Construction
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Gaming -see also- Awards, Medals; Bingo; Lottery; Raffles
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Public Schools
Referendum
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Teachers
Statutes:Article - XIX - Video Lottery Terminals
(1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 3:25 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/15/20182/15/2018First Reading Senate Rules
2/15/20182/16/2018Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
2/21/20182/21/2018Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20183/6/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m.
3/7/20183/7/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable with Amendments {869430/1 Report Adopted46
Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 46
3/15/20183/15/2018Floor Amendment {713425/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted47
Floor Amendment {263226/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (16-29)47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means50
3/23/20183/23/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
4/6/20184/6/2018Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/6/20183/28/2018Favorable Report Adopted62
Floor Amendment {253225/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-82)62
Second Reading Passed62
4/6/20183/29/2018Third Reading Passed (130-2)63
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 357

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:32 P.M.