SB1125

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Public School Opportunities Enhancement Act

Sponsored by:

Senator Ferguson

Status:

Veto sustained (0-46)


Synopsis:Establishing the Public School Opportunities Enhancement Program; providing that the purpose of the Program is to provide grants to local school systems, community schools, and nonprofit organizations in the State to assist in expanding or creating extended day and summer enhancement programs and to expand and support educational programs during the school day for specified organizations; requiring the Governor, for fiscal years 2018 through 2021, to include $7,500,000 annually in the State budget for the program
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Ferguson, McFadden, Pugh, Nathan-Pulliam, and Conway
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1402
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Children
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Grants
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Libraries -see also- Archives
Mass Transit -see also- Buses; Railroads
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
Youth -see also- Minors
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-1701 through 7-1706)
Article - Human Services
(8-1101 through 8-1107)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/26/20162/26/2016First Reading Senate Rules
3/1/20163/2/2016Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
3/2/20163/2/2016Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
3/11/20163/11/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
3/28/20163/28/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/28/20163/24/2016Favorable with Amendments {169835/153
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted53
3/29/20163/25/2016Favorable with Amendments {169835/1 Adopted54
Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 54
Floor Amendment (Senator McFadden) {323627/1 Adopted54
Floor Amendment (Senator Norman) {423123/1 Rejected54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/30/20163/26/2016Third Reading Passed (32-13)55
House3/31/20163/26/2016First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations58
4/4/20164/4/2016Rereferred to Ways and Means
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20164/8/2016Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/8/20164/2/2016Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/9/20164/4/2016Third Reading Passed (87-47)67
Senate4/11/20164/3/2016Returned Passed63A
Post Passage5/27/20165/27/2016Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate1/18/20171/18/2017Veto sustained (0-46)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.