SB1200

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Internet Consumer Privacy Rights Act of 2017

Sponsored by:

Senator Rosapepe

Status:

In the House - Referred Economic Matters


Synopsis:Making it an unfair or deceptive trade practice under the Maryland Consumer Protection Act for an Internet service provider to sell or transfer for marketing purposes a consumer's personally identifying information without the consumer's express and affirmative permission; requiring the Joint Committee on Cybersecurity, Information Technology, and Biotechnology to monitor the enforcement and impact of provisions of the Act on consumers, Internet service providers, and other businesses in the State; requiring a specified report; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Rosapepe, Lee, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee HearingEconomic Matters
Broad Subject(s):Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Narrow Subject(s):Advertising
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Discrimination
Electronic Commerce -see also- Electronic Funds Transfer
Electronic Communication -see also- Comm; Elec.Gov; Lang; Te
Emergency Bills
Identification
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Privacy
Unfair Trade Practices
Statutes:Article - Commercial Law
(13-101, 13-301, 13-321)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 9:19 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate4/4/20173/29/2017First Reading Finance
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted58
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted58
Referred Finance58
4/5/20174/5/2017Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/7/20174/1/2017Committee Amendment {397075/1 Adopted61
Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 61
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted62
Floor Committee Amendment {307576/1 Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/10/20174/3/2017Third Reading Passed (34-13)63
House4/10/20174/3/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations68
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Delegate Frick) Adopted (116-18)68
Referred Economic Matters68

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 9:19 A.M.