SB1265 (CH0030)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018

Sponsored by:

Senator Klausmeier

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30


Synopsis:Requiring the Maryland Center for School Safety to collaborate with certain persons and entities to provide a comprehensive approach to school safety; requiring the School Safety Subcabinet to develop a model policy for building assessment teams; requiring the development of a training curriculum for school resource officers and other school security employees; authorizing the Safe Schools Fund to provide grants to local school systems to enhance school safety; requiring a $10,000,000 annual appropriation to the Fund for certain purposes;etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Klausmeier, Miller, Waugh, Serafini, Edwards, Astle, Bates, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Ferguson, Guzzone, Manno, Salling, Kasemeyer, King, Lee, Madaleno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Reilly, Rosapepe, Zucker, Hershey, and Jennings
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Appropriations
Assessments
Baltimore City
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Child Care
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Communications -see also- Electronic Comm; Language; Telecom
Construction
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Counselors -see also- Guidance Counselors; Social Workers
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Curriculum
Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Disclosure
Eastern Shore
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication -see also- Comm; Elec.Gov; Lang; Te
Emergencies
Grants
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Job Training -see also- Continuing Education
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Local Government Mandates
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities -see also- Women
Motor Vehicle Registration
Notices
Parents and Guardians -see also- Adoption; Child Custody
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Schools
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Cybersecurity; Occupational Safety
School Administration
State Police, Department of
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Threats -see also- Harrassment; Violence
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation -see also- Aircraft; Airports; Boats; etc
Violence -see also- Domestic Violence; Harassment; Threats
Statutes:Article - Education
(4-318, 7-1501 through 7-1503, 7-1502.1, 7-1504, 7-1505, 15-123, 7-1506, 7-1507 through 7-1511, 7-1512)
Article - General Provisions
(4-201, 4-314.1)
Article - Public Safety
(3-101, 4-201, 4-202, 4-203, 4-204, 3-520)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(6-226)
Article - Transportation
(17-106)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 21, 2018 4:28 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate3/13/20183/13/2018First Reading Senate Rules45
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Waugh) Adopted45
Referred Senate Rules45
3/16/20183/16/2018Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
3/19/20183/19/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20184/4/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
4/4/20183/30/2018Favorable with Amendments {829138/1 Report Adopted61
Floor Committee Amendment {789735/1 Adopted61
Floor Committee Amendment {939631/1 Adopted61
Floor Amendment {223621/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected (5-40)61
Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 61
4/5/20183/31/2018Floor Amendment {193529/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted62
Floor Amendment {703025/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted (25-20)62
Floor Amendment {703523/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted62
Floor Amendment {393226/1 (Senator Salling) Adopted62
Floor Amendment {503124/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted62
Floor Amendment {543527/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted62
Floor Amendment {843425/1 (Senator Madaleno) Rejected (18-26)62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted62A
Third Reading Passed (44-0)62A
House4/5/20183/27/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations61A
4/6/20184/6/2018Rereferred to Ways and Means
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20184/7/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/7/20183/30/2018Favorable with Amendments {865662/1 Report Adopted64
Floor Committee Amendment {655168/1 Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/9/20184/1/2018Floor Committee Amendment {945267/1 Adopted66
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)66
Senate4/9/20184/3/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (44-1)65
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 12:58 P.M.