St. Mary's County Delegation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 8)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0257 / CH0094St. Mary's County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership RequirementsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 94Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeFamily Law (D4)
HB0285St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery LicenseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0288 / CH0096St. Mary's County - Public Facility BondsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 96Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0301 / CH0364St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 6 Pub-Brewery LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 364Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0423St. Mary's County - Building Impact FeesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0520St. Mary's County - Public Officials - SalariesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0555 / CH0378St. Mary's County - Building Impact Fees - DeferralsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 378Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1507 / CH0690St. Mary's County - Property MaintenanceApproved by the Governor - Chapter 690Environmental Matters
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.