Rules

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 37

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
SJ0004Support of the Efforts of the Nagorno-Karabakh Republic to Develop as a Free and Independent NationSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1054
    (HB1515 / CH0429)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB1009Special Thoroughbred Racing - State Fair Society - Racing DaysSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesHorse Racing (C6)
SB0975Maryland Health Care Commission - Certificate of Need Review - Interested PartySenator PipkinIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0964
    (HB1272)
Maryland College Sports Fans and Athletes Bill of RightsSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesHigher Education (F2)
SB0962
    (HB1438)
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Rate RegulationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0958
    (HB1474)
Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital FundsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0936
    (HB0949)
SmartStat Technical Assistance and Support CenterSenator YoungIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesLocal Government - Generally (L6)
SB0927
    (HB1362)
Allegany County - Board of Education - Ex Officio Member - RepealSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB0918
    (HB0646 / CH0629)
Gaming - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' OrganizationsSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesGaming (C7)
SB0910
    (HB1021)
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - RepealSenator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0906Transportation - Life Cycle Cost AnalysisSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB0869Public Ethics - Members of the General Assembly - Meals, Receptions, and BeveragesSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/13/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0851Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Len Bias Statue at Northwestern High SchoolSenator RamirezIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0839General Assembly and Department of Legislative Services - Reduction in Paper UseSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/13/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0836
    (HB1114)
Health Care Malpractice - Awards and Judgments - Periodic PaymentsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0835
    (HB1265)
Patient Safety Early Intervention ProgramsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPublic Health (J1)
SB0834
    (HB1310)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Senator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0727Members of the General Assembly - Whistleblower ProtectionSenator MuseIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0713Task Force on Democracy and Representative Government in Maryland for the 21st CenturySenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/13/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0695Public Ethics - General Assembly - Employment with Political Subdivisions and Public Institutions of Higher EducationSenator FergusonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesEthics (G2)
SB0495
    (HB0381)
General Assembly Members - Business Communications as Private Citizens - NoticeSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledRulesState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0284 / CH0043Annual Corrective BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 43Rules
1/30/2013 - 10:45 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/4/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0283 / CH0042Annual Curative BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 42Rules
1/30/2013 - 10:45 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/4/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1386
    (SB0916 / CH0579)
Task Force to Study Licensing and Continuing Education Requirements for ElectriciansDelegate Haddaway-RiccioIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic MattersRulesBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1325Transportation - Capital Projects - Life Cycle Cost AnalysisDelegate WoodIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB1231State Aid - Business Transparency and Financial Disclosure ActDelegate McMillanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1187
    (SB0887 / CH0572)
Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic SystemsDelegate HuckerIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1173Small Business Energy Assistance ActDelegate KramerIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1169
    (SB0639 / CH0513)
Civil Rights Tax Relief ActDelegate HuckerIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1139
    (SB0886)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with DealersDelegate FrushIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1011
    (SB0682 / CH0525)
Portable Electronics Insurance - Compensation of Employees of Vendor, Disclosures to Customers, and StudyDelegate JamesonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0874Task Force to Study Access of Individuals with Mental Illness to Regulated Firearms - ExtensionDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
RulesPublic Safety (E4)
HB0525
    (SB0516 / CH0283)
Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating DeficitsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0524
    (SB0643)
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
RulesTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB0061
    (SB0632 / CH0511)
State Brain Injury Trust FundDelegate McConkeyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
1/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPublic Health (J1)
HB0037
    (SB0175 / CH0199)
State Government - Commemorative Days - Maryland Centenarians DayDelegate Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.