HB1401 (CH0715)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Enoch Pratt Free Library - Hours of Operation - Funding

Sponsored by:

Delegate Robinson, B.

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 715


Synopsis:Requiring a State grant to be made available to fund the increased operating expenses for the branches of the Enoch Pratt Free Library that increase their operating hours above the hours in effect as of January 1, 2016; requiring the Governor to include in the State operating budget, in fiscal years 2018 through 2022, $3,000,000 in general funds to support the increased Library operating expenses; requiring Baltimore City to provide a 25% match for each dollar of State funds granted to support increased Library expenses; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates B. Robinson, Anderson, Branch, Carter, Chang, Clippinger, Conaway, Glenn, Hammen, Hayes, Haynes, Lierman, McCray, McIntosh, Oaks, Rosenberg, and M. Washington
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1171
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Education - Local Bills
Counties - Local Laws
Narrow Subject(s):Baltimore City
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Education, State Department of
Grants
Libraries -see also- Archives
Reports
Time
Statutes:Article - Education
(23-402)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/12/20162/12/2016First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20163/18/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/18/20163/16/2016Favorable with Amendments {385469/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/19/20163/17/2016Third Reading Passed (100-32)49
Senate3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation48A
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20163/28/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/28/20163/24/2016Favorable with Amendments {369231/253
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted53
3/29/20163/25/2016Favorable with Amendments {369231/254
Committee Amendment Adopted54
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/30/20163/26/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)55
House4/6/20163/30/2016House Concur - Senate Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (93-44)62
Passed Enrolled62
Post Passage5/28/20165/28/2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 715

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:06 P.M.