SB0528 (CH0499)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Hate Crimes Group Victim

Sponsored by:

Senator Astle

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from committing certain acts against another person or a group because of another person's or group's race, color, religious beliefs, sexual orientation, gender, disability, or national origin, or because another person or group is homeless.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Astle, Brochin, Cassilly, Kelley, Lee, Muse, Ramirez, Smith, and Zirkin
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  View Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Discrimination
Harassment -see also- Threats
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(10-304)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 4:27 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {578675/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)42
House3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Judiciary43
3/13/20183/13/2018Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20184/3/2018Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/3/20183/25/2018Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/7/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed (133-4)64
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:34 P.M.