SB0751 (CH0678)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Plug-In Electric Drive and Hybrid Vehicles

Sponsored by:

Senator Simonaire

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 678


Synopsis:Extending the termination date to September 30, 2022, for certain provisions of law authorizing certain hybrid vehicles to use a certain high occupancy vehicle (HOV) lane regardless of the number of passengers under certain circumstances; extending the termination date to September 30, 2022 for certain provisions of law making certain requirements regarding the use of HOV lanes by plug-in electric drive vehicles applicable to qualified hybrid vehicles; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Simonaire
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0714
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  View Committee HearingEnvironment and Transportation
Broad Subject(s):Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Narrow Subject(s):Alternative Energy Sources
Highways
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Sunset
Statutes:Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2010, 2013, 2016)
Article - Transportation
(25-108)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 18, 2018 4:03 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/9/20183/9/2018Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed44
3/14/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (44-1)46
House3/14/20183/11/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation45
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed61A
4/9/20184/4/2018Third Reading Passed (132-6)69
Senate12/8/20174/5/2018Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 678

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:17 P.M.