HB0012

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Crimes - Aiming Laser Pointer at Aircraft

Sponsored by:

Delegate Arora

Status:

In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments


Synopsis:Making it a misdemeanor to knowingly and willfully shine, point, or focus the beam of a laser pointer on an individual operating an aircraft; exempting specified individuals under specified circumstances from provisions of the Act; specifying a penalty; and specifying that a sentence imposed under the Act is in addition to a specified other sentence.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Arora
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0019
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Aircraft
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Nuisances -see also- Noise; Weeds
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(3-807)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House9/4/20129/4/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/2/20131/2/2013Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2/11/20132/11/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
2/12/20132/12/2013Favorable Report Adopted25
Second Reading Passed25
2/14/20132/14/2013Third Reading Passed (139-0)27
Senate2/15/20132/15/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings26
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable with Amendments {978378/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.