HB0071 (CH0495)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495;Item ZA00(I) - Maryland Hall for the Creative Arts - Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2016


Synopsis:Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $1,063,670,134, the proceeds to be used for specified necessary building, construction, demolition, planning, renovation, conversion, replacement, and capital equipment purchases of the State, for acquiring specified real estate in connection therewith, and for grants to specified subdivisions and other organizations for specified development and improvement purposes, subject to specified requirements; etc.
Analysis:Not available at this time
All Sponsors:The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0056
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015, June 1, 2016, June 1, 2017, June 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
AppropriationsBudget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Capital Budget
Narrow Subject(s):Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Capital Budgets
State Bonds
Statutes:Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2004, 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:40 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20151/23/2015First Reading Appropriations
3/30/20153/30/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/30/20153/26/2015Favorable with Amendments56
Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 56
4/1/20153/28/2015Favorable with Amendments58
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted58
Committee Amendment (#2-5) Adopted58
Committee Amendment (#6-14) Adopted58
Committee Amendment (#15-27) Adopted58
Committee Amendment (#28-47)58
Committee Amendment (#28-39) Adopted58
Committee Amendment (#40) Adopted58
Committee Amendment (#41-47) Adopted58
Committee Amendment (#48-116) Adopted58
Committee Amendment (#117-125) Adopted58
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed with Amendments58
4/2/20153/29/2015Third Reading Passed (129-10)59
Senate4/3/20153/29/2015First Reading Senate Rules56
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator DeGrange) Adopted56
Referred Budget and Taxation56
4/6/20154/6/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
4/6/20153/30/2015Favorable with Amendments57
Special Order until 4/8 (Senator DeGrange) Adopted 57
4/8/20154/1/2015Favorable with Amendments59
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted59
Committee Amendment (#2-6) Adopted59
Committee Amendment (#7-10) Adopted59
Committee Amendment (#11-28) Adopted59
Committee Amendment (#29-36) Adopted59
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted59
Floor Amendment (Senator Bates) {113426/1 Rejected (15-32)59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator DeGrange) Adopted (47-0)59
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)59
House4/9/20154/3/2015House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments64
House Requests Senate Recede64
Conference Committee Appointed64
Delegates Jones, McIntosh, Gaines, Haynes, and Zucker64
House advisors:64
(Delegates Proctor and Beitzel)64
Senate4/9/20154/2/2015Senate Refuses to Recede60
Conference Committee Appointed60
Senators DeGrange, Kasemeyer, Peters, Currie, and Edwards60
Senate advisors:60
(Senators Madaleno and McFadden)60
House4/13/20154/9/2015Conference Committee Report Adopted70
Third Reading Passed (125-14)70
Senate4/13/20154/8/2015Conference Committee Report Adopted66
Third Reading Passed (47-0)66
House4/13/20154/9/2015Passed Enrolled66
Post Passage5/22/20155/22/2015Vetoed in part by the Governor (Policy)
5/31/20155/31/2015Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 495 (Line Item Veto)
House1/13/20161/13/2016Motion Special Order vote on line item veto until 1/20/2016 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
1/20/20161/20/2016Line item veto overridden (92-49)
Senate1/21/20161/21/2016Line item veto overridden (32-14)
Post Passage1/21/20161/21/2016Item ZA00(I) - Maryland Hall for the Creative Arts - Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2016

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:40 P.M.