HB0085 (CH0474)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming

Sponsored by:

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474


Synopsis:Authorizing specified organizations in Anne Arundel County to conduct a card game, card tournament, or casino event under specified circumstances; requiring an organization to obtain a permit from the County Department of Inspections and Permits; specifying that a permit holder may receive no more than one permit per calendar year; requiring a participant in specified gaming events to be at least 21 years of age; requiring an individual who volunteers as an operator of specified gaming events to be at least 18 years of age; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Anne Arundel County Delegation
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0764 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Gaming
Narrow Subject(s):Age of Majority -see also- Minors
Alcoholic Beverages -see also- AB-By Subd; Subst Abuse; etc.
Anne Arundel County
Awards, Medals and Prizes -see also- Gaming
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Gaming -see also- Awards, Medals; Bingo; Lottery; Raffles
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Rules and Regulations
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(13-401, 13-404, 13-408, 13-404.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2017 11:59 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/16/20171/16/2017First Reading Ways and Means
1/24/20171/24/2017Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/2/20173/2/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/3/20173/3/2017Favorable with Amendments {935564/1 Report Adopted38
Second Reading Passed with Amendments38
3/7/20173/7/2017Third Reading Passed (138-0)40
Senate3/9/20173/9/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation40
3/15/20173/15/2017Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable with Amendments {669632/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/10/20174/3/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)63A
House4/10/20174/5/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments70
Third Reading Passed (136-0)70
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:10 A.M.