HB0091 (CH0389)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions Day

Sponsored by:

Delegate Morhaim

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389


Synopsis:Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim April 16 as National Healthcare Decisions Day.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Morhaim, Hammen, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rose, Saab, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0442
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0045 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Narrow Subject(s):Advance Medical Directives
Governor
Health -see also- Mental Health
Holidays and Special Dates
Statutes:Article - General Provisions
(7-405 through 7-416, 7-405)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:57 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20161/18/2016First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/21/20161/21/2016Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
1/27/20161/27/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/03 at 3:00 p.m.
3/17/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/17/20163/15/2016Favorable with Amendments {286081/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/21/20163/18/2016Third Reading Passed (125-10)50
Senate3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48A
4/7/20164/7/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/7/20164/1/2016Favorable Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed61A
4/11/20164/3/2016Third Reading Passed (44-1)63A
House4/11/20164/5/2016Returned Passed68
Post Passage5/10/20165/10/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:57 P.M.