HB0406 (CH0362)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Clean Cars Act of 2017

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362


Synopsis:Extending through fiscal year 2020 the Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program and authorization to issue motor vehicle excise tax credits for specified qualified plug-in electric drive vehicles; increasing the total amount of rebates from up to $600,000 to a maximum of $1,200,000; increasing the amount required to be transferred from the Strategic Energy Investment Fund to the Transportation Trust Fund; increasing the amount of motor vehicle excise tax credits that may be issued during a fiscal year; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Afzali, Anderton, Aumann, Beitzel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Clark, Cluster, Davis, Flanagan, Folden, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, Otto, Reilly, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, B. Wilson, Wivell, Beidle, Jalisi, and McCray
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0315
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Budget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Energy Matters -see also- Alt Energy Sou; Fuel; Power Plants
Excise Tax
Industry and Technology
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Tax Credits
Transportation -see also- Aircraft; Airports; Boats; etc
Statutes:Article - State Government
(9-2009)
Article - Transportation
(13-815)
Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2014)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 9:07 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/26/20171/26/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation
2/2/20172/2/2017Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20173/18/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/18/20173/15/2017Favorable with Amendments {340912/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/20/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (123-11)50
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation46A
3/21/20173/21/2017Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable with Amendments {107577/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Middleton) Adopted62
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)62
House4/10/20174/4/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments69
Third Reading Passed (129-11)69
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 9:07 A.M.