HB0716

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Anne Arundel County - Board of Education

Sponsored by:

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Status:

In the House - Passed Enrolled


Synopsis:Requiring that, beginning with the 2018 general election, specified members of the Anne Arundel County Board of Education be elected by councilmanic districts; altering the membership, purpose, and duties of the renamed School Board Appointment Commission of Anne Arundel County; repealing specified provisions of law relating to the approval or rejection of the retention of specified members of the county board by county voters; altering the amount of the scholarship granted to a specified student member of the county board; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Anne Arundel County Delegation
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0899
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017, November 1, 2020
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Education - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Anne Arundel County
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Education, Boards of
Elections -see also- Ballots; Camp Financ; Pol Cands; Voting
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Statutes:Article - Education
(3-108, 3-110, 3-114, 3-2A-01 through 3-2A-10, 3-2A-02, 3-2A-03, 3-2A-04, 3-2A-06, 3-2A-08, 3-2B-01)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 13, 2017 4:43 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/2/20172/2/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/7/20172/7/2017Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments {425962/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/17/20173/14/2017Third Reading Passed (138-0)48
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20173/31/2017Favorable Report Adopted60
Floor Amendment {353628/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/10/20174/2/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-1)62
House4/10/20174/3/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments68
Third Reading Passed (139-0)68
Passed Enrolled68

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2017 3:41 P.M.