HB1396 (CH0415)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Theft-Related Crimes - Penalties

Sponsored by:

Delegate Conaway

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415


Synopsis:Altering penalties for a conviction of extortion, malicious destruction of property, obtaining property or services by bad check, credit card fraud, identity fraud, State health plan fraud, and exploitation of a vulnerable adult involving a value at or over $1,000; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Conaway, Vallario, Anderson, Cluster, Dumais, Dwyer, Glass, Hough, K. Kelly, McDermott, Mitchell, Rosenberg, and Simmons
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Checks
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Forms
Fraud -see also- Forgery
Notices
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
State Employees
Theft -see also- Shoplifting
Statutes:Article - Commercial Law
(15-803)
Article - Criminal Law
(3-404, 3-701, 3-702, 6-301, 8-106, 8-206, 8-207, 8-209, 8-301, 8-516, 8-801)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/14/20132/14/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/20132/26/2013Rereferred to Judiciary
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20133/22/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/22/20133/19/2013Favorable Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed52
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (133-0)53A
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20134/8/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/8/20134/4/2013Favorable Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed66
4/8/20134/5/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)67
House4/8/20134/4/2013Returned Passed68
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:06 P.M.