HB1499 (CH0419)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419


Synopsis:Providing that a candidate may join a slate or continue as a member of a slate only under specified circumstances; altering limits on the aggregate amount of contributions a person may make in an election cycle; requiring that contribution limits and transfer limits be adjusted in a specified manner at specified times; providing that contributions by two or more business entities be considered as being made by one contributor under specified circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The Speaker (By Request - Commission to Study Campaign Finance Law) and Delegates Cardin, George, and Summers
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1039
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013, January 1, 2015
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Elections
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Advertising
Attorney General
Auditors and Audits
Ballots
Campaign Financing
Citations
Communications -see also- Language; Telecommun & Info Tech
Comptroller
Consumer Price Index
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Corporations -see also- Municipal Corps; Public Corps & Inst
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Disclosure
District Courts
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Funds Transfer
Electronic Government
Ethics
Evidence
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Forms
Gaming -see also- Bingo; Lottery; Raffles
General Assembly -see also- AELR Cmte; Leg Policy Committee
Gifts
Governor
Interstate Affairs
Judgments
Lieutenant Governor
Limited Liability Companies
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Notices
Partnerships
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Political Candidates
Political Committees
Privacy
Procurement
Public Officials -see also- Atty Gen; Compt; Coun Admin; etc
Raffles
Real Estate Investment Trusts
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Registration -see also- Motor Vehicle Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Prosecutor
Statutes of Limitation
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Trials
Witnesses
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(5-106)
Article - Election Law
(1-101, 13-202, 13-207, 13-208.1, 13-209, 13-214, 13-220.1, 13-222, 13-226, 13-227, 13-228, 13-234, 13-235, 13-240, 13-301, 13-304, 13-305, 13-306, 13-307, 13-309, 13-309.1, 13-309.2, 13-327, 13-331, 13-340, 13-505, 13-604.1, 14-101, 14-102, 14-103, 14-104, 14-105, 14-106, 14-107, 14-108, 14-109, 2-102, 5-303, 9-207)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/28/20132/28/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/5/20133/6/2013Rereferred to Ways and Means
3/6/20133/6/2013Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {145068/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/21/20133/18/2013Third Reading Passed (136-0)51
Senate3/22/20133/20/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs51
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/20133/27/2013Favorable with Amendments {744738/158
Special Order until later today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 58
Favorable with Amendments {744738/158
Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 58
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {744738/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/3/20133/29/2013Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {623027/1 Adopted60
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-2)60
House4/8/20134/2/2013House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments66
House Requests Senate Recede66
Conference Committee Appointed66
Delegates Cardin, Summers, and George66
Senate4/8/20134/4/2013Senate Refuses to Recede66
Conference Committee Appointed66
Senators Ferguson, Dyson, and Jennings66
House4/8/20134/4/2013Conference Committee Report Adopted68
Third Reading Passed (128-7)68
Senate4/8/20134/6/2013Conference Committee Report Adopted68
Third Reading Passed (42-2)68
House4/8/20134/5/2013Passed Enrolled68
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.