HB1662 (CH0237)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kramer

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237


Synopsis:Prohibiting retail pet stores from offering for sale, transferring, or disposing of cats or dogs; repealing certain provisions of law that authorize the sale of certain cats and dogs and set forth the requirements for a retail pet store that offers to sell certain cats or dogs under certain circumstances; stating the intent of the General Assembly that animal welfare organizations initiate contact with retail pet stores to facilitate the showcasing of dogs and cats for adoption or for purchase from local breeders; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Kramer, Busch, Arentz, Aumann, Barkley, Barve, Brooks, Carey, Chang, Cullison, Davis, Fennell, Frush, Hixson, Impallaria, Jameson, Kelly, Lam, R. Lewis, Luedtke, Metzgar, Miele, Moon, Morales, Platt, Robinson, Sanchez, Stein, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, K. Young, Branch, Clippinger, Frick, Lisanti, Mautz, and A. Miller
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018, January 1, 2020
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Business Regulation and Occupations
Narrow Subject(s):Agriculture, Department of
Animals -see also- Birds; Dogs
Animal Shelters
Citations
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Exemptions
Inspections -see also- Motor Vehicle Inspection
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Rules and Regulations
Time
Veterinarians
Statutes:Article - Business Regulation
(19-701, 19-702, 19-702.1, 19-703, 19-704, 19-705, 19-706, 19-707)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 2:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/15/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments {213390/1 Report Adopted46
Special Order until next session (Delegate Rey) Adopted 46
Floor Amendment {973520/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected46A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46A
3/16/20183/13/2018Third Reading Passed (123-11)47
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {447276/1 Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)63
House4/7/20183/30/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (129-8)64
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.