SB0078 (CH0044)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Lottery and Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Remittance of Intercepted Prizes

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44


Synopsis:Repealing a requirement that the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency or a video lottery operation licensee wait 15 days before transferring the prize of a restitution obligor or a child support obligor to the Central Collection Unit or the Child Support Enforcement Administration, respectively; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Lottery and Gaming Control Agency)
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Gaming
Narrow Subject(s):Appeals -see also- Judicial Review
Attachments and Garnishments
Hearings
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Restitution
Support of Dependents -see also- Alimony
Statutes:Article - Criminal Procedure
(11-618)
Article - Family Law
(10-113.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate10/5/201510/5/2015Pre-filed
1/13/20161/13/2016First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2/8/20162/8/2016Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/9/20162/9/2016Favorable Report Adopted19
Second Reading Passed19
2/11/20162/11/2016Third Reading Passed (47-0)21
House2/12/20162/12/2016First Reading Ways and Means23
3/10/20163/10/2016Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/30/20163/30/2016Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/30/20163/25/2016Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
3/31/20163/26/2016Third Reading Passed (135-0)58
Senate3/31/20163/27/2016Returned Passed56
Post Passage4/12/20164/12/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:07 P.M.