SB0212 (CH0474)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2014

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474


Synopsis:Prohibiting discrimination based on gender identity with regard to public accommodations, housing, and employment and by specified licensed or regulated persons; altering the applicability of specified provisions of law prohibiting discrimination in places of public accommodation; prohibiting discrimination based on sexual orientation or gender identity with regard to commercial leasing; altering the applicability of provisions of law prohibiting discrimination in employment; providing specified immunity; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Madaleno, Raskin, Manno, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Gladden, Jones-Rodwell, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Kittleman, McFadden, Montgomery, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Robey, Rosapepe, Young, and Zirkin
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1265
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0449 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings   View Committee HearingHealth and Government Operations
Broad Subject(s):Human Relations
Narrow Subject(s):Discrimination
Hotels and Motels
Housing -see also- Apartments; Condos; Mobile & Manuf Homes
Leases and Rent
Real Estate -see also- Agents and Brokers
Restaurants
Sexual Orientation
State Employees
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:55 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/16/20141/16/2014First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/17/20141/17/2014Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25/20142/25/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/26/20142/26/2014Favorable with Amendments {718878/134
Laid Over (Senator Pugh) Adopted34
2/27/20142/27/2014Favorable with Amendments {718878/1 Report Adopted35
Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) {783326/135
Special Order until 2/28 (Senator Jacobs) Adopted 35
2/28/20142/28/2014Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) {783326/1 Withdrawn36
Floor Amendment (Senator Getty) {903721/2 Adopted36
Second Reading Passed with Amendments36
3/4/20143/4/2014Third Reading Passed (32-15)38
House3/5/20143/5/2014First Reading Health and Government Operations41
3/26/20143/26/2014Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
3/26/20143/21/2014Favorable Report Adopted57
Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (47-87)57
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {893726/157
Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected (50-83)57
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) Withdrawn57
Second Reading Passed57
3/27/20143/22/2014Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {963220/1 Rejected (59-77)58
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {343329/158
Motion vote previous question (Delegate McHale) Adopted (79-58)58
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (57-80)58
Floor Amendment (Delegate Bates) {993828/1 Rejected (1-131)58
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDermott) {383828/1 Rejected (53-80)58
Floor Amendment (Delegate Boteler) {133626/1 Rejected (44-90)58
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {483124/1 Rejected (53-79)58
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDermott) {883023/1 Rejected (50-83)58
Third Reading Passed (82-57)58
Senate3/28/20143/21/2014Returned Passed55
Post Passage5/15/20145/15/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:55 P.M.