SB0217 (CH0160)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Physical Resistance

Sponsored by:

Senator Kelley

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160


Synopsis:Establishing that evidence of physical resistance by a victim is not required to prove that a sexual crime was committed; establishing that a specified provision of the Act may not be construed to affect the admissibility of evidence of actual physical resistance by a victim of a sexual crime; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Kelley, Astle, Benson, Cassilly, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Ready, Reilly, Robinson, Rosapepe, Simonaire, Smith, Zirkin, Hough, Muse, Norman, Brochin, and Ramirez
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0429
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  View Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Evidence
Sexual Offenses
Victims -see also- Criminal Injuries Compensation
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(3-319.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/19/20171/19/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/25/20171/25/2017Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20172/20/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/21/20172/21/2017Favorable with Amendments {478779/1 Report Adopted28
Second Reading Passed with Amendments28
2/23/20172/23/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)30
House2/24/20172/24/2017First Reading Judiciary33
3/16/20173/16/2017Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20173/31/2017Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/31/20173/27/2017Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/4/20173/28/2017Third Reading Passed (140-0)62
Senate4/5/20173/30/2017Returned Passed59
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:09 P.M.