SB0361

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability Act

Sponsored by:

Senator Raskin

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Voiding a provision of a specified contract or agreement that attempts or purports to waive specified rights or reduce specified liability as against public policy; providing for the treatment of specified information relating to a chemical constituent used in hydraulic fracturing for the purposes of specified action; requiring a permittee to file with the Department of the Environment and a specified local health department documentation stating the composition of the injection fluid used for hydraulic fracturing of the well; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Raskin and Zirkin
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  View Committee HearingEnvironment and Transportation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Civil Actions and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Damages
Death -see also- Advance Medical Directives; Wrongful Death
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Evidence
Fuel -see also- Coal
Hazardous and Toxic Substances -see also- Asbestos; Radiatn
Health -see also- Mental Health
Insurance -see also- Health Ins; MAIF; Motor Vehicle Ins
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Negligence -see also- Medical Malpractice
Real Property
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Wells
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(3-2101 through 3-2105)
Article - Environment
(14-111)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/28/20161/28/2016First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/4/20162/4/2016Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20163/7/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/8/20163/8/2016Favorable with Amendments {268372/139
Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Edwards) Adopted 39
3/10/20163/10/2016Favorable with Amendments {268372/1 Report Adopted41
Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {213627/141
Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted41
3/11/20163/11/2016Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {213627/142
Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 42
3/15/20163/15/2016Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {213627/144
Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 44
3/16/20163/16/2016Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {213627/1 Withdrawn45
Floor Amendment (Senators Zirkin and Edwards) {503325/1 Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/17/20163/17/2016Third Reading Passed (41-5)46
House3/17/20163/15/2016First Reading Environment and Transportation47
3/21/20163/21/2016Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20163/21/2016Hearing cancelled
3/21/20163/21/2016Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20163/29/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.