SB0369 (CH0067)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Prekindergarten Programs - Notification of Eligibility by Local Departments of Social Services

Sponsored by:

Senator Ferguson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67


Synopsis:Requiring specified local departments of social services and specified local health departments, under specified circumstances, to provide specified parents or guardians with an oral and written notice that their child may be eligible for publicly funded prekindergarten programs; requiring specified local departments of social services and specified local health departments to report annually to the General Assembly on the number of parents who were given a notification and who subsequently enrolled their child in the specified program; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Ferguson, King, Benson, Currie, Guzzone, Kelley, Klausmeier, Madaleno, McFadden, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Raskin, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1095
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Education - Miscellaneous
Children
Narrow Subject(s):Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Guardians
Health -see also- Mental Health
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Notices
Public Information
Public Schools
Reports
Social Services -see also- Welfare
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-101.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/28/20161/28/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2/29/20162/29/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/20163/1/2016Favorable with Amendments {184034/1 Report Adopted34
Second Reading Passed with Amendments34
3/3/20163/3/2016Third Reading Passed (47-0)36
House3/4/20163/4/2016First Reading Ways and Means38
3/11/20163/11/2016Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20164/4/2016Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/4/20163/28/2016Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/5/20163/29/2016Third Reading Passed (135-0)61
Senate4/6/20163/31/2016Returned Passed60
Post Passage4/12/20164/12/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.