SB0585 (CH0307)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Commercial Law - Patent Infringement - Assertions Made in Bad Faith

Sponsored by:

Senator Middleton

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from making specified assertions of patent infringement in bad faith; authorizing a court to consider specified factors as evidence of whether a person has made an assertion of patent infringement in bad faith or in good faith; authorizing specified individuals to bring an action in a specified court to recover for injuries or losses sustained as a result of a violation of the Act; authorizing a court to award damages and remedies under specified circumstances; specifying an exception; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Middleton, Brinkley, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, and Pugh
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Finance   View Committee HearingEconomic Matters
Broad Subject(s):Commercial Law - Generally
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Attorneys' Fees
Attorney General
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Claims
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Court Costs
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Damages
Evidence
Industry and Technology
Investigations and Inquiries -see also- Crim Bckgrnd Invest
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:56 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/30/20141/30/2014First Reading Finance
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/3/20143/3/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/4/20143/4/2014Favorable with Amendments {537679/1 Report Adopted38
Second Reading Passed with Amendments38
3/6/20143/6/2014Third Reading Passed (44-0)40
House3/7/20143/7/2014First Reading Economic Matters43
4/2/20144/2/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
4/2/20143/26/2014Favorable with Amendments {253799/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/3/20143/27/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)63
Senate4/4/20143/26/2014Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments60
Senate Requests House Recede60
Conference Committee Appointed60
Senators Astle, Pugh, and Kittleman60
House4/7/20144/3/2014Motion Recede (Delegate Davis) Adopted70
House Recede70
Third Reading Passed (137-0)70
Senate4/8/20144/1/2014Returned Passed66A
Post Passage5/5/20145/5/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:56 P.M.