SB0644 (CH0069)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open Data

Sponsored by:

Senator Ferguson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69


Synopsis:Establishing a State policy that open data be machine readable and released to the public in specified ways; establishing a Council on Open Data; providing for the composition, appointment, terms, chairs, and staffing of the Council; requiring the Council to promote the policy on open data by providing specified guidance and policy recommendations, advocating for specified practices, and making recommendations on the purchasing of specified data processing devices, systems, or software; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Ferguson, Currie, Dyson, Jacobs, Jones-Rodwell, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, and Raskin
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1260
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs   View Committee HearingHealth and Government Operations   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Regulations and Procedures
State Government - Procurement
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Local Government - Generally
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
State Government - General Assembly
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Electronic Government
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Governor
Information Technology, Department of
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Procurement
Public Information
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:56 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/30/20141/30/2014First Reading Senate Rules
2/5/20142/5/2014Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs19
2/6/20142/6/2014Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20143/14/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/20143/11/2014Favorable with Amendments {554839/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/17/20143/12/2014Third Reading Passed (47-0)46
House3/18/20143/15/2014First Reading Health and Government Operations51
3/19/20143/19/2014Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/1/20143/25/2014Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/2/20143/26/2014Third Reading Passed (132-0)62
Senate4/3/20143/25/2014Returned Passed59
Post Passage4/8/20144/8/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:56 P.M.