SJ0001 (JR0003)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution

Sponsored by:

Senator Frosh

Status:

Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3


Synopsis:Rescinding Maryland's ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Frosh, Benson, Conway, Currie, Dyson, Gladden, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, Rosapepe, Brochin, Forehand, Hershey, Jacobs, Stone, and Zirkin
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HJ0002
Bill File Type: Regular
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings   View Committee HearingRules and Executive Nominations   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Government - General Assembly
Private Sector Labor and Industry
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Narrow Subject(s):Congress, U.S.
Constitution, U.S.
Federal Government
Governor
Human Rights
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:57 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/13/20141/13/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/20141/15/2014Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings6
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2/17/20142/17/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Favorable with Amendments {508575/1 Report Adopted27
Second Reading Passed with Amendments27
2/19/20142/19/2014Third Reading Passed (47-0)29
House2/20/20142/20/2014First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations32
3/26/20143/26/2014Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.
4/4/20144/4/2014Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
4/5/20143/29/2014Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/7/20143/31/2014Third Reading Passed (136-0)67
Senate4/7/20143/29/2014Returned Passed63
Post Passage5/5/20145/5/2014Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:57 P.M.