SB0684

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass

Sponsored by:

Senator Garagiola

Status:

In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations


Synopsis:Limiting the eligibility of qualifying biomass as a Tier 1 renewable source for the renewable energy portfolio standard to qualifying biomass used at a generation unit that started commercial operation on or after January 1, 2005, and that achieves a system efficiency of 65% or more; providing that before January 1, 2018, qualifying biomass used at a generation unit that started commercial operation on or before December 31, 2004, and was certified on or before December 31, 2005, is eligible as a Tier 1 renewable source; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Garagiola, Ferguson, Klausmeier, Montgomery, Pinsky, Ramirez, Raskin, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1102
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Finance  Listen to Committee HearingRules and Executive Nominations
Broad Subject(s):Utility Regulation
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Alternative Energy Sources
Appropriations
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Energy Matters -see also- Alt Energy Res; Fuel; Power Plants
Fuel -see also- Coal
Grants
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Trees
Utilities -see also- High Voltage Lines; Telephones; Water
Statutes:Article - Public Utilities
(7-701, 7-704)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 29, 2013 10:09 P.M.