HB0012

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Crimes - Aiming Laser Pointer at Aircraft

Sponsored by:

Delegate Arora

Status:

In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House9/4/20129/4/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/2/20131/2/2013Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2/11/20132/11/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
2/12/20132/12/2013Favorable Report Adopted25
Second Reading Passed25
2/14/20132/14/2013Third Reading Passed (139-0)27
Senate2/15/20132/15/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings26
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable with Amendments {978378/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.