HB0066 (CH0433)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - Sundays

Sponsored by:

Dorchester County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/11/20131/11/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {780014/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/21/20133/18/2013Third Reading Passed (125-5)51
Senate3/22/20133/20/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs51
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.