HB0226 (CH0003)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/21/20131/21/2013First Reading Economic Matters
1/22/20131/22/2013Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {943995/130
Special Order until later today (Delegate Davis) Adopted 30
Favorable with Amendments {943995/1 Report Adopted30
Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 30
2/20/20132/20/2013Floor Amendment (Delegate Bates) {473225/1 Rejected (43-90)31
Floor Amendment (Delegate Serafini) {263624/1 Rejected (45-90)31
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {813429/1 Rejected (46-87)31
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {563928/1 Rejected (44-89)31
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {253220/1 Rejected (50-83)31
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDermott) {563526/1 Rejected (45-86)31
Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) {793724/1 Rejected (44-86)31
Floor Amendment (Delegate Myers) {193722/1 Rejected (44-89)31
Second Reading Passed with Amendments31
2/22/20132/22/2013Third Reading Passed (86-48)33
Senate2/25/20132/25/2013First Reading Finance32
2/26/20132/26/2013Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments {567175/138
Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted38
3/6/20133/6/2013Favorable with Amendments {567175/139
Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 39
3/7/20133/7/2013Favorable with Amendments {567175/1 Report Adopted40
Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {843924/1 Rejected (19-27)40
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {923325/1 Rejected (13-31)40
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {433328/1 Rejected (17-28)40
Floor Amendment (Senator Colburn) {513326/1 Rejected (16-30)40
Floor Amendment (Senator Getty) {123325/1 Rejected (16-29)40
Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {333526/1 Rejected (14-31)40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/8/20133/8/2013Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {663620/2 Rejected (14-31)41
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {513922/1 Rejected (16-28)41
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {833528/1 Rejected (13-33)41
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (30-15)41
House3/18/20133/15/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments48A
Third Reading Passed (88-48)48A
Passed Enrolled48A
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:05 P.M.