HB0286

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Specialized Intervention Services - Reports

Sponsored by:

Delegate Korman

Status:

In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20171/23/2017First Reading Ways and Means
1/26/20171/26/2017Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20173/29/2017Favorable with Amendments {715864/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/6/20173/30/2017Third Reading Passed (119-20)64
Senate4/7/20174/1/2017First Reading Senate Rules61
4/10/20174/10/2017Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:59 P.M.