HB0373 (CH0608)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Cecil County - Home Detention and Release Programs

Sponsored by:

Cecil County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20181/24/2018First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/26/20182/26/2018Favorable Report by Judiciary
2/27/20182/27/2018Favorable Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed35
3/1/20183/1/2018Third Reading Passed (138-0)37
Senate3/2/20183/2/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings38
3/6/20183/6/2018Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20184/9/2018Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/9/20184/4/2018Favorable Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed66
4/9/20184/5/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)67
House4/10/20184/5/2018Returned Passed70
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:16 P.M.