HB0425 (CH0844)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lierman

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/26/20171/26/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/14/20173/11/2017Favorable with Amendments {525766/1 Report Adopted45
Special Order until 03/15 (Delegate Cassilly) Adopted 45
3/15/20173/12/2017Floor Amendment {773820/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (49-87)46
Floor Amendment {743428/4 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-91)46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/16/20173/13/2017Third Reading Passed (91-48)47
Senate3/17/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {124732/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/7/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-11)61
House4/8/20174/1/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments66
Third Reading Passed (90-46)66
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/27/20175/27/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:00 P.M.