HB0602 (CH0787)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017

Sponsored by:

Delegate Robinson

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 787


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/30/20171/30/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20173/20/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/20/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments {380416/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/20/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (139-1)51
Senate3/21/20173/19/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/10/20174/3/2017Third Reading Passed (35-12)63A
House4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed69
Post Passage5/27/20175/27/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 787

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:01 P.M.