HB0616

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Small or Independent Film Entities

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, M.

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/8/20183/8/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/15/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments {905566/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/16/20183/13/2018Third Reading Passed (133-3)47
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation48A
3/19/20183/19/2018Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 19, 2018 12:41 P.M.