HB0968 (CH0397)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018

Sponsored by:

Delegate Barnes, B.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Appropriations
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 2/15 at 3:00 p.m.
4/4/20184/4/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
4/4/20183/26/2018Favorable with Amendments {654462/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/5/20183/27/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)61
Senate4/6/20184/1/2018First Reading Senate Rules63
4/9/20184/9/2018Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/9/20184/4/2018Favorable Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed66
4/9/20184/5/2018Third Reading Passed (42-2)67
House4/10/20184/5/2018Returned Passed70
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.