HB1101 (CH0403)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Medical Marijuana - Academic Medical Centers - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission

Sponsored by:

Delegate Morhaim

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
2/20/20132/20/2013Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2/27/20132/27/2013Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
3/5/20133/5/2013Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)
Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
3/21/20133/21/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/22/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {616480/1 Report Adopted52
Floor Committee Amendment {846885/1 Adopted52
Special Order until 3/23 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 52
3/23/20133/20/2013Second Reading Passed with Amendments53
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (108-28)54
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20134/2/2013Special Order until later today (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 64
Third Reading Passed (42-4)64
House4/8/20134/4/2013Returned Passed68
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:06 P.M.