HB1174

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Natural Resources - Oysters - Tolerance for Seafood Dealers

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jacobs

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20182/8/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
3/14/20183/11/2018Favorable Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed45
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (135-1)46A
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48A
3/19/20183/19/2018Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 3, 2018 7:53 P.M.