HB1292 (CH0500)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law – Law Enforcement – Prohibition on Sexual Activity

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lierman

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Judiciary
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20183/19/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/19/20183/14/2018Favorable with Amendments {712510/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (138-0)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48B
3/20/20183/20/2018Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20184/9/2018Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/9/20184/4/2018Favorable Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed66
4/9/20184/5/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)67
House4/10/20184/5/2018Returned Passed70
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:34 P.M.