HB1454 (CH0842)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit – Commercial Rehabilitations – Affordable Housing

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, A.

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 842


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/27/20183/20/2018Favorable with Amendments {395862/1 Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/28/20183/21/2018Third Reading Passed (109-29)55
Senate3/29/20183/26/2018First Reading Senate Rules57
4/4/20184/5/2018Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
4/9/20184/9/2018Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/9/20184/2/2018Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/9/20184/3/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)65
House4/9/20184/3/2018Returned Passed68
Post Passage5/26/20185/26/2018Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 842

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.