HB1613

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian - Adverse Immigration Action

Sponsored by:

Delegate Sanchez

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Judiciary
2/15/20182/15/2018Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20183/17/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/17/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {312316/1 Report Adopted47A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47A
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (130-6)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48B
3/20/20183/20/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 20, 2018 11:30 A.M.