SB0145

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Statewide Kindergarten Assessment - Completion

Sponsored by:

Senator Pinsky

Status:

Veto sustained (0-44)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/16/20171/16/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
1/18/20171/18/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 1/25 at 3:00 p.m.
1/30/20171/30/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/20171/31/2017Favorable Report Adopted14
Second Reading Passed14
2/2/20172/2/2017Third Reading Passed (45-0)16
House2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Ways and Means18
3/1/20173/1/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/30/20173/30/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/30/20173/26/2017Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
3/31/20173/27/2017Third Reading Passed (138-0)61
Senate4/3/20173/28/2017Returned Passed57
Post Passage5/26/20175/26/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate1/12/20181/12/2018Veto sustained (0-44)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 12, 2018 3:29 P.M.