SB0156 (CH0532)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Participation in Court Proceedings - Retaliation

Sponsored by:

Senator Cassilly

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/15/20161/15/2016First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
2/8/20162/8/2016Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/9/20162/9/2016Favorable Report Adopted19
Second Reading Passed19
2/11/20162/11/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)21
House2/12/20162/12/2016First Reading Judiciary23
3/18/20163/18/2016Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20164/7/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
4/7/20163/31/2016Favorable with Amendments {672519/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/8/20164/2/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)65
Senate4/9/20164/3/2016Senate Concur - House Amendments63
Third Reading Passed (45-0)63
Passed Enrolled63
Post Passage5/19/20165/19/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.