SB0168 (CH0431)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and Procedures

Sponsored by:

Senator Feldman

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/15/20181/15/2018First Reading Finance
1/17/20181/17/2018Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2/15/20182/15/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2/16/20182/16/2018Favorable with Amendments {237578/1 Report Adopted28
Second Reading Passed with Amendments28
2/20/20182/20/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)30
House2/21/20182/21/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations31
3/7/20183/7/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
3/27/20183/20/2018Favorable Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed54
3/28/20183/21/2018Third Reading Passed (139-0)55
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.