SB0191 (CH0027)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, and 2015

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20161/20/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation
3/21/20163/21/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/21/20163/18/2016Favorable with Amendments47A
Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Peters) Adopted 47A
3/22/20163/20/2016Favorable with Amendments49
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#2-12) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#13-19) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#20-30) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#31-49) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#50-113) Adopted49
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/23/20163/21/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)50
House3/23/20163/21/2016First Reading Appropriations53
3/28/20163/28/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/28/20163/23/2016Favorable with Amendments55A
Special Order until 3/29 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 55A
3/29/20163/24/2016Favorable with Amendments56
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted56
Committee Amendment (#2-7) Adopted56
Committee Amendment (#8-24) Adopted56
Committee Amendment (#25-31) Adopted56
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed with Amendments56
3/30/20163/25/2016Floor Amendment (Delegate McMillan) {813125/1 Rejected (55-77)57
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (130-7)57
Senate3/30/20163/26/2016Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments55
Senate Requests House Recede55
Conference Committee Appointed55
Senators DeGrange, Kasemeyer, Peters, Currie, and Edwards55
Senate advisors:55
(Senators Madaleno and Ferguson)55
House3/30/20163/25/2016House Refuses to Recede57
Conference Committee Appointed57
Delegates Jones, Ghrist, Haynes, McIntosh, and A. Miller57
House advisors:57
(Delegates Gaines and Reznik)57
Senate3/31/20163/27/2016Conference Committee Report Adopted (35-11)56
Third Reading Passed (44-2)56
House3/31/20163/26/2016Conference Committee Report Adopted58
Third Reading Passed (121-15)58
Senate3/31/20163/27/2016Passed Enrolled58
Post Passage4/8/20164/8/2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.