SB0224 (CH0804)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime

Sponsored by:

Senator Lee

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/19/20171/19/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Favorable with Amendments {968671/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/20/20173/18/2017Third Reading Passed (26-21)47
House3/21/20173/18/2017First Reading Judiciary52
3/21/20173/21/2017Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/10/20174/5/2017Favorable Report Adopted70
Second Reading Passed70
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Frick) Adopted (111-19)70
Third Reading Passed (98-34)70
Senate4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/27/20175/27/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 30, 2017 12:54 P.M.